Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 85 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7092 Week
» 13226 Month
» 241110 Year
» 1462675 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 75015 m/e 12/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 391
To Service During 12/1951 to Southport (27C)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/12/1967
Scrapping During 06/1968 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 16 yrs , 1 mth

Allocations
Code Name From Date
27C Southport (New) m/e 12/1951
8L Aintree w/e 14/12/1963
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 25/04/1964
10G Skipton w/e 20/03/1965
10A Carnforth w/e 11/02/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 30/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 27C Southport w/e 22/12/1951
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/12/1951
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 10G Skipton 2w/e 10/04/1965
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 04/03/1967
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 30/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/03/1959 Derby Works (Erecting shop No 1 bay) Paint shop-42396I, 42501I, 44426I, 48010G, 48517G, D5010 new. Diesel erecting shop-10202, 10800, 11127, 12001, 12066, 12088, 13028, 6 0-6-0 DIE shunters (new work), (D3763-8). Erecting shop No 1 bay-40684I, 42409G, 42515G, 43850 G, 44123 I, 44134 I, 44179 G, 47454 G, 47645 G, 47679 I, 48141 I, 48335 G, 73142 I, 73157 I, 75015 I, 75028 G, 75031 G, 75041 G, stripping-42522, 44162, 48621, 80067. Erecting shop No. 2 bay-42374I, 44102 G, 44130 I, 47425 I, 48223(1), 73130 I, 73141 I, stripping-42529, 47526. Erecting shop No. 3 bay-6 Bo-Bo (D5014-19 new) 1160 H.P. D/E, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/E Yard-40047/564/680/1000/49/143/57/65, 42354/509/98, 43292/324, 44145/599, 47309, 48194/304/653/699, 10001, 10100, D5009/13 and Cecil Raikes. All stored locos. remain with following additions-47563 (opp. station and not for scrap), 40461, 41121, 43553/946/70, 47426 (opp. m.p.d.). *41000 was noted on 22nd March in the Erecting shop stripped down; also noted on this date in the shops were 40671 an 53807. SLS/195904
16/10/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D6, D211, D312, D2908/9/13, D5084/9, 10203, 11146. Diesel Test House: D3, D138/9, D226, 11145, 12100. Shunter Test House: 12096. New Building: D142-D151. Finishing Shop: D76, D140/1, D5024, D8000. Erecting Shop: D3578, 12078, 13122/3, 42198, 42368, 42421, 44172/8, 44213/94, 44436, 47250, 47350/88/99, 48001/53/7, 48356, 48439, 58850 frames only, 73073, 73137/59, 75015/30/5. Paint Shop: 42408, 44185, 48491, 73010. In Works Sidings: ED3, D1, D10, D43, D75, D89, D2501, D5143, 10202, 12000/54, 41168, 41804, 42328, 42404, 42510/21/4, 43295, 43593, 43905, 44033, 44232/48, 47218/68/98, 47529, 47666, 48009/10, 48185, 48380, 73158, 75017, 92059. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75015
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Southport (27C)
   
14/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
25/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
20/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
11/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75015    

prev prev