Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3969 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17375 Week
» 70391 Month
» 189918 Year
» 3216771 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7501 |
06/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25151 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
06/10/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
16/11/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
06/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/10/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
16/11/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
06/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7501 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (16F) |
|
|
02/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
16/11/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
18/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
25/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25151 |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X) |
|
|
26/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
23/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
07/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
12/09/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25151 |
|
|
11/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Toton MPD |
|
|