Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2577 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 7730 Week
» 142546 Month
» 345210 Year
» 3372063 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7445 |
on |
31/03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
74xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
380 |
To Service |
Tue 31/03/1950 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 10/03/1964 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
m/e |
31/03/1950 |
ALLOC |
83D |
Laira |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
ALLOC |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
ALLOC |
81F |
Oxford |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
ALLOC |
87G |
Carmarthen |
4w/e |
11/08/1962 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
29/09/1963 |
ALLOC |
87G |
Carmarthen |
4w/e |
31/12/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
5w/e |
30/03/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/03/1950 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7445 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
13/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
11/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) |
|
|
10/03/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7445 |
|
|
08/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|