Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2274 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20077 Week
» 73093 Month
» 192620 Year
» 3219473 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73167 |
on |
13/04/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/09/1962 |
Derby MPD |
Ex Works on Shed: D3121 (18A), D5000 (1A), D5141 (1A), 42075, 42413 (55G), 73090 (89A), 73159 (15E), 73163 (55G), 73167 (55E). 70046 (21D) was on shed and 48623 (2B) was noted on a West bound freight. |
SLS/196210 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/04/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73167 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
31/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (55E) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
15/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D) |
|
|
07/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73167 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|