Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 618 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31268 Week
» 129913 Month
» 332577 Year
» 3359430 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73154 |
on |
14/06/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/06/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73154 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
25/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stirling (65J) |
|
|
25/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73154 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|