Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1626 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15032 Week
» 68048 Month
» 187575 Year
» 3214428 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73112 |
on |
22/10/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
70D |
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
14/09/1964 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
12/10/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/06/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/03/1960 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop:-30060/6/133/247/701/88, 34011/5/27/8/33/61/82/92/106, 41304, 73082/112/4, 76019, 80039/42/83/137; Boxhill. Dump:-30770; Ex-works:- 32103, 34050/70, 41312; Waiting works:-30056/129/4035/504, 76055, 80140; Ex-works:- 32104 (75C), 73050 (82F), 80095 (6C) plate, 73118; On shed (damaged):- 34084. |
SLS/196004 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/10/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73112, name: MORGAN LE FAY Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
14/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
20/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73112 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|