Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 490 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19401 Week
» 84355 Month
» 287019 Year
» 3313872 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73107 |
on |
23/12/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
65A |
Eastfield |
on |
23/12/1955 |
ALLOC |
60A |
Inverness |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
ALLOC |
63A |
Perth South |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
ALLOC |
66B |
Motherwell |
4w/e |
11/07/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/09/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1963 |
Settle-Carlisle diversions (Stored) |
Settle-Carlisle trains have been running via Ingleton during March in the daytime; single line operation at Dent during the night. The 'Waverley' is expected to be resumed between Leeds and Edinburgh in April. |
SLS/196304 |
30/03/1963 |
Forfar MPD (Stored) |
On shed at Forfar on0th March, 1963: In steam 45473 (pilot), 44796/97, 44879, 45475, Stored 60522, 73107, 44257 (now cut up), 54486/89/93, 54500, 55263, 56347. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/12/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73107 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
06/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
26/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
25/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
02/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73107 |
|
|
06/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|