Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 508 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18311 Week
» 71327 Month
» 190854 Year
» 3217707 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73105 |
on |
09/12/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
65A |
Eastfield |
on |
09/12/1955 |
ALLOC |
65F |
Grangemouth |
5w/e |
18/01/1965 |
ALLOC |
65J |
Stirling |
3w/e |
30/10/1965 |
ALLOC |
67F |
Stranraer |
3w/e |
30/10/1965 |
ALLOC |
67A |
Corkerhill |
5w/e |
11/06/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/09/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/12/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73105 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
26/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
30/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stirling (65J) |
|
|
25/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
23/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73105 |
|
|
02/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|