|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 20/06/1950 | 26/06/1950 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Swindon Works | 15/05/1952 | 30/06/1952 | 47 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2914 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
114457 | |
Swindon Works | 24/02/1954 | 31/03/1954 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7635 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2407 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
218490 | |
Swindon Works | 18/01/1956 | 23/02/1956 | 37 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7663 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2640 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
329661 | |
Swindon Works | 08/03/1957 | 05/09/1957 | 182 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7647 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2683 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
399165 | |
Swindon Works | 07/05/1959 | 14/07/1959 | 69 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7661 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2699 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
495868 | |
Swindon Works | 18/03/1961 | 11/05/1961 | 55 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7680 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4001 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
584327 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/06/1950 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 7030, name: CRANBROOK CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g Diagram HC boiler fitted |
||
17/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
20/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/06/1950. Dep: 26/06/1950. | ||
15/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/05/1952. Dep: 30/06/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 2914 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/02/1954. Dep: 31/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7635 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2407 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 18/01/1956. Dep: 23/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7663 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2640 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/03/1957. Dep: 05/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7647 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2683 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/12/1958 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4071 | ||
07/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/05/1959. Dep: 14/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7661 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2699 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
18/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/03/1961. Dep: 11/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7680 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4001 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/02/1962 | To Store | To Store at Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
01/05/1962 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
01/02/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7030 from Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
12/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by R A Kings: Norwich |