Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19241 Week
» 72257 Month
» 191784 Year
» 3218637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
70028 |
on |
27/10/1952 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
27/10/1952 |
ROYAL STAR |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/09/1961 |
Britannia class 7s |
The remaining 12 B.R. Britannias on the W.R. (70016/8/9/20/2-9) (from 88A, Cardiff Canton) were transferred to the L.M.R. on 10th September. In the small hours of that morning 6 went light-engine to Shrewsbury, one worked a freight to Shrewsbury and another the 7-10 a.m. to London. Two more (70019/26) were at that time stopped at Worcester and Swindon and will presumably go direct from there. 70023/4 were retained in service against non-arrival of replacements and finally worked the 8-55 a.m. passenger and 12-55 a.m. freight to Shrewsbury respectively on 13th September. In replacement, Canton has been allocated 4083, 5020/53/73/91/6, 6010/24 an 7016 together with seven Halls. The two Kings are to strengthen the power on the Shrewsbury road. There are indications that this is only a part of re-arrangements involving redistribution of steam power from the west of England as 5058 (ex Laira) was observed in transit to Gloucester the same weekend. 70025/7/8 subsequently arrived at Bescot and are working goods and mineral trains. 70026 arrived at Aston. |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/10/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 70028, name: ROYAL STAR Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (21D) |
|
|
31/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (21D) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (21D) |
|
|
25/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
29/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
26/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
17/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
16/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 70028 |
|
|
17/01/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|