Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 67 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17870 Week
» 70886 Month
» 190413 Year
» 3217266 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7 |
28/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
44007 |
27/02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
44 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Route Disc Indicators Nose end Gangway |
|
Cost when Built |
£129,371.00 |
To Service |
28/11/1959 to Camden (1B) |
Withdrawn |
30/11/1980 off Toton (TO) |
Time in Service |
21 yrs , 2 dys |
Cut Up |
11/1981 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Derby) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
28/11/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
03/1973 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/11/1960 |
E.4983 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
£345/-/- |
|
£345/-/- |
07/09/1963 |
R.12347 |
Bogie Frame Strengthening |
|
£107/18/1 |
£23/5/4 |
£131/3/5 |
07/09/1963 |
R.12286 |
SLM Exhausters
|
|
£14/10/- |
£4/-/- |
£18/10/- |
07/09/1963 |
C/RC/19 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
£196/10/- |
|
£196/10/- |
by 10/1975 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/11/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/11/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
07/09/1963 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
by 10/1975 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS, Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Derby Works |
28/06/1960 |
n/a |
|
07/07/1960 |
Non Classified |
|
|
8 days |
8 days |
£3,202.00 |
23,661 |
|
Derby Works |
01/10/1960 |
86 days |
|
04/11/1960 |
Light Casual |
1 day |
12 days |
16 days |
29 days |
£171.00 |
44,517 |
|
Derby Works |
18/01/1961 |
75 days |
|
28/01/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
4 days |
5 days |
9 days |
£1,839.00 |
57,147 |
|
Crewe Works |
24/07/1961 |
177 days |
|
12/08/1961 |
Light Casual |
3 days |
5 days |
9 days |
17 days |
£1,926.00 |
92,293 |
|
Crewe Works |
15/01/1962 |
156 days |
|
09/06/1962 |
Heavy Casual |
|
2 days |
122 days |
124 days |
£3,830.00 |
121,105 |
|
Derby Works |
09/04/1963 |
304 days |
|
30/08/1963 |
Heavy Casual |
|
1 day |
112 days |
113 days |
|
151,150 |
|
Derby Works |
12/03/1964 |
195 days |
|
15/04/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
1 day |
27 days |
28 days |
|
|
|
Performance Statistics (Form E.R.O 3666)
Year |
Annual Mileage |
Cumulative Mileage |
Fuel Oil Utilised |
Approximate Miles/Gallon |
Classified Wait Repair |
Classified Wait Works |
Classified On Works |
Classified Total (Wkdys) |
Running Repairs |
Running Repair & Exams Cost |
Wkdys Not Required for Service |
Wkdys Stored Serviceable |
Wkdys Stored Unserviceable |
Total Weekdays Unavailable |
1959 |
1,259 |
1,259 |
2,960g |
0.43 |
|
|
|
|
23 |
£42 |
|
|
|
23 |
1960 |
55,054 |
56,313 |
62,477g |
0.88 |
1 |
12 |
24 |
37 |
82 |
£1,451 |
21 |
|
|
140 |
1961 |
59,344 |
115,657 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1962 |
24,452 |
140,109 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1963 |
24,627 |
164,736 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7, name: INGLEBOROUGH Built at Derby Works Allocated to Camden (1B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Derby (17A) |
|
|
23/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
07/07/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 07/07/1960. Stopped on 28/06/1960 |
|
|
04/11/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 04/11/1960. Stopped on 01/10/1960 |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 28/01/1961. Stopped on 18/01/1961 |
|
|
12/08/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 12/08/1961. Stopped on 24/07/1961 |
|
|
03/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
09/06/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 09/06/1962. Stopped on 15/01/1962 |
|
|
30/08/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 30/08/1963. Stopped on 09/04/1963 |
|
|
07/09/1963 |
Modification |
Modification: Bogie Frame Strengthening |
|
|
07/09/1963 |
Modification |
Modification: SLM Exhausters
|
|
|
07/09/1963 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
15/04/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Dep: 15/04/1964. Stopped on 12/03/1964 |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
27/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44007 |
|
|
10/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
30/11/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44007 from Toton (TO) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|