Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 847 Today
» 5975 Yesterday
» 6822 Week
» 105467 Month
» 308131 Year
» 3334984 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6988 |
on |
17/03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
Modified Hall |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
366 |
To Service |
Mon 17/03/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/09/1964 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1948 |
Swindon Works |
Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. |
SLS/194805 |
18/05/1963 |
Wolverhampton (Stafford Road) Works (In Works) |
In Works1424, 3607(84G), 3763, 4132/55, 4278, 4646/80, 5263, 5938/75, 6690(88J), 6900/04/16/60/88, 7210, 9790/4. Waiting Works: L92 (ex-5786), 2896, 4255, 6648. Ex Works: 8400, 6134. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/03/1948 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6988 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (WEY) |
|
|
30/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
21/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (82D) |
|
|
21/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6988 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|