28/01/1962 |
Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works |
1017(89A), 1639, 1650, 3200, 3622, 3631, 3831, 4154, 4270(88A), 4555(83A), 4645, 4663, 4946(89A), 5254(87B), 5658, 5957(81F), 6125, 6137, 6326, 6976/9, 7248, 7329, 7439, 8753(81C), 9612/23/46, 82041, 92227(88A). Works Yard: 2287(89C), D3028, D3979. Waiting Works: 3708(86G), 4179(84A), 4608(81C), 6150(81F), 6972(82B), 6992(85A), 75024(84E). |
SLS/196203 |
04/03/1962 |
Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 1011 (82B), 2287 (89C), 3622, 3677 (82B), 3692 (87B), 3708 (86G), 3833 (86A), 4122 (87H), 4179, 4696, 5774, 5901/77, 6110, 6125 (87H), 6137/50, 6326 (88A), 6972 (82B), 6974/6/92, 7200 (87F), 7236, 7804 (87G), 9623 (82B), 9782, 75024, 92227 (88A). Works Yard: 1451 (83C), 2268 (82D), 2856, 4140, 4608, 7807 (89D), 9633 (83C), D3037, D3977. |
SLS/196204 |
09/12/1962 |
Cardiff East Dock MPD |
There is no diesel locomotive whatever here and CED is now a full main line shed for the first time in its life ! This must be unique in railway history and the steam phase is expected to last two years as Canton is being demolished completely to make way for a diesel shed and main diesel depot for S. Wales. On 9th December, 1962, the following were on shed-1613, 2875/97, 3662, 3782/4, 3804/10, 4090, 4242/72/82, 5043/74/81/97, 5220/4/5/9, 5749, 6606/37/81, 6813/32/75/6, 6918/32/45/56/72/7/87/95, 7016, 7913, 8425/97, 9426/37, 9629, 92003/236/44/6. |
SLS/196302 |
17/03/1963 |
Swindon Works ('A' Shop) |
Triangle: 4612, 4915, 5027/95, 5931, 6112, 8472. Works Yard: 3769/84, 4082, 5072/78, 5659, 6011/18/25/26, 6369, 6815, 6933, 7314, 8773/76, 9725, D6352. Weigh House: 6944, 7822. 'C' Shop: W.D. 71528. Dump: 2883, 4939, 5023, 6101, 6342/48, 6422, 6962, 8770, 9652, 9727/44/47/59/75, 7334. Dismantling Shed: 5020. 'A' Shop: D35, D101, D809, D813/18, D825/29, D1001/7/11/35. D1018-27 new - in various stages of oonstruction, D3189, D3365/98, D3424, D3505/06/22/25, D4000, D6311, D7002/32/38, 3687, 3755, 3836, 4623/73/77, 5006, 5775, 6855, 6918/22/61/72, 7919/25/28, 8109, 8433/81, 9437, 9648/66/80, 15100/05. Stock Shed: D7072 New. On Running Shed: 6000. Ex Works: 3837, 6819/78, 7913, 8459, 9405. |
SLS/196304 |
24/04/1963 |
Derby MPD ('A' Shop) |
42636 was badly damaged when it fell into the pit at Derby on 24th April. It is now on works undergoing assessment. |
SLS/196304 |