Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 590 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6374 Week
» 27763 Month
» 147290 Year
» 3174143 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6971 |
18/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37271 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/4) |
37418 |
15/11/1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 37 | 18/03/1965 | 37/4 | 15/11/1985 |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3531/D960 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
18/03/1965 to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
Withdrawn |
01/04/2005 |
Time in Service |
40 yrs , 14 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
18/03/1965 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1979 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/03/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
04/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1979 |
xbt |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6971 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3531 Allocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37271 |
|
|
04/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
02/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
12/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
15/11/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37418 |
|
|
01/04/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37418 |
|
|