Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 685 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6469 Week
» 27858 Month
» 147385 Year
» 3174238 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6967 |
11/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37267 |
05/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/4) |
37421 |
05/12/1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 37 | 11/02/1965 | 37/4 | 05/12/1985 |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3527/D956 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
11/02/1965 to Tinsley (41A) |
Withdrawn |
01/04/2005 |
Time in Service |
40 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
11/02/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
13/12/1967 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/02/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
13/12/1967 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6967 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3527 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
13/12/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
23/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/02/1968 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
04/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37267 |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
05/12/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37421 |
|
|
01/04/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37421 |
|
|