Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1177 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6961 Week
» 28350 Month
» 147877 Year
» 3174730 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6950 |
10/12/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37250 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3507/D938 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
10/12/1964 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Withdrawn |
31/12/2007 |
Time in Service |
43 yrs , 21 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
10/12/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
20/11/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/12/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
20/11/1974 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 03/1980 |
xot |
Dual brakes, No heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/12/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6950 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3507 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37250 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
26/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
20/11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
04/09/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
31/12/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37250 |
|
|