Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 33 Today
» 4309 Yesterday
» 22145 Week
» 75161 Month
» 194688 Year
» 3221541 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6936 |
29/04/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37236 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37682 |
1986 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
29/04/1964 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
10/2014 |
Time in Service |
50 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy |
Cut Up |
04/11/2016 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
29/04/1964 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 10/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 31/12/1972 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/04/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/04/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6936 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
20/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
27/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
28/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
31/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
31/12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37236 |
|
|
1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37682 |
|
|
10/2014 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37682 |
|
|
04/11/2016 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|