Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 824 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6608 Week
» 27997 Month
» 147524 Year
» 3174377 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6919 |
16/01/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37219 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
16/01/1964 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Withdrawn |
31/08/2005 |
Time in Service |
41 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
16/01/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1971 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/01/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6919 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
22/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
28/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
25/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
13/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
03/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37219 |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
31/08/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37219 |
|
|