Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 483 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6267 Week
» 27656 Month
» 147183 Year
» 3174036 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6916 |
02/01/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37216 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
02/01/1964 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
28/02/2007 |
Time in Service |
43 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
02/01/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
26/07/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/01/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
26/07/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
xot |
Dual brakes, No heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6916 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
24/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
31/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
04/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
26/07/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
18/09/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37216 |
|
|
18/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37216 |
|
|