Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 416 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21450 Week
» 120095 Month
» 322759 Year
» 3349612 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6901 |
18/10/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37201 |
12/10/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
18/10/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
30/12/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 09/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/10/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
30/12/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/10/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6901 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
30/12/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
12/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37201 |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
03/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|