Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3056 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30235 Week
» 21291 Month
» 367715 Year
» 3394568 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6900 |
15/10/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37200 |
02/02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (2)) |
37377 |
13/05/1988 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
15/10/1963 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Withdrawn |
01/12/2001 |
Time in Service |
38 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 10/2009 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
15/10/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
06/12/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 10/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1981 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/10/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
06/12/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
09/1981 |
xot |
Dual brakes, No heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/10/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6900 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37200 |
|
|
10/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
09/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
13/05/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37377 |
|
|
01/12/2001 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37377 |
|
|
10/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|