Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1797 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7581 Week
» 28970 Month
» 148497 Year
» 3175350 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6890 |
21/01/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37190 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (1)) |
37314 |
25/07/1986 |
|
TOPS (37/0 (R)) |
37190 |
04/10/1988 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
21/01/1964 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
01/07/1993 |
Time in Service |
29 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
21/01/1964 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
87E |
|
Landore (New) |
on |
21/01/1964 |
ED |
|
Eastfield |
on |
01/11/1981 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/07/1993 |
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1974 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/01/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1974 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6890 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37190 |
|
|
03/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
25/07/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37314 |
|
|
04/10/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37190 |
|
|
01/07/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37190 |
|
|