Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1162 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6946 Week
» 28335 Month
» 147862 Year
» 3174715 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6888 |
16/01/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37188 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
16/01/1964 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
31/03/2006 |
Time in Service |
42 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
16/01/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/07/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1974 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/1974 |
|
Headlight(s) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 09/1977 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/10/1977 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/01/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/07/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1974 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
10/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 09/1977 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
08/10/1977 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6888 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/07/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37188 |
|
|
10/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) removed |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
08/10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
22/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
31/03/2006 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37188 |
|
|