Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3476 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16882 Week
» 69898 Month
» 189425 Year
» 3216278 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6867 |
16/09/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37167 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (2)) |
37383 |
05/01/1998 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
16/09/1963 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
15/08/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/09/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
15/08/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
xot |
Dual brakes, No heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
10/01/1970 |
Severe |
|
Mechanical seizures or failures |
Electrical insulation |
Not Known |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/09/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6867 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
15/08/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37167 |
|
|
06/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
05/01/1998 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37383 |
|
|
01/02/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37383 |
|
|
01/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Crewe LNWR |
|
|