Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3103 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16509 Week
» 69525 Month
» 189052 Year
» 3215905 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6860 |
05/07/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37160 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (2)) |
37373 |
20/07/1988 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
05/07/1963 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
14/02/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/07/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
14/02/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6860 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
03/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
03/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
14/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
23/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37160 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
29/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
07/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (ML) |
|
|
20/07/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37373 |
|
|
01/12/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37373 |
|
|
07/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Old Oak Common TMD |
|
|