Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 524 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19435 Week
» 84389 Month
» 287053 Year
» 3313906 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6854 |
11/07/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37154 |
09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
11/07/1963 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 10/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 09/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
03/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/07/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6854 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
20/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37154 |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
02/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
07/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|