Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 926 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6710 Week
» 28099 Month
» 147626 Year
» 3174479 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6850 |
01/07/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37150 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/9M) |
37901 |
30/10/1986 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
01/07/1963 to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
Withdrawn |
01/11/1998 |
Time in Service |
35 yrs , 4 mths |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
01/07/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/12/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 09/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/07/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/12/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6850 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
24/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37150 |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
30/10/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37901 |
|
|
01/11/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37901 |
|
|