Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4248 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17654 Week
» 70670 Month
» 190197 Year
» 3217050 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6848 |
19/06/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37148 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/9M) |
37902 |
30/10/1986 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
19/06/1963 to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
Withdrawn |
01/12/1998 |
Time in Service |
35 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys |
Cut Up |
04/2005 |
Cut At |
Sims Metals (Beeston) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
19/06/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/06/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/06/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6848 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
24/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
26/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37148 |
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
30/10/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37902 |
|
|
01/12/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37902 |
|
|
04/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Sims Metals: Beeston |
|
|