Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 115 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17918 Week
» 70934 Month
» 190461 Year
» 3217314 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6842 |
17/05/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37142 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
17/05/1963 to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
Withdrawn |
01/05/1997 |
Time in Service |
33 yrs, 11 mths , 14 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
17/05/1963 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/05/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/05/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6842 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
20/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37142 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
01/05/1997 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37142 |
|
|