Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 485 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19396 Week
» 84350 Month
» 287014 Year
» 3313867 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6838 |
26/04/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37138 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
26/04/1963 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/04/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/04/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6838 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
24/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
28/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37138 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
19/05/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37138 |
|
|
16/07/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Toton Training Compound |
|
|