Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1655 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25286 Week
» 90240 Month
» 292904 Year
» 3319757 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6830 |
25/03/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37130 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37681 |
1986 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
25/03/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
14/01/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
14/01/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/03/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
14/01/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/03/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6830 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
14/01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
14/01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
19/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
16/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
30/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
20/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37130 |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37681 |
|
|
01/08/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37681 |
|
|
08/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Crewe Works |
|
|