Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2439 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15845 Week
» 68861 Month
» 188388 Year
» 3215241 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6829 |
20/03/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37129 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37669 |
1986 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
20/03/1963 to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
20/03/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/12/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/03/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/12/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/03/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6829 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
27/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
05/12/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
16/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
30/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
20/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37129 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37669 |
|
|