Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 814 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18617 Week
» 71633 Month
» 191160 Year
» 3218013 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6814 |
20/02/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37114 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
20/02/1963 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Withdrawn |
31/12/2007 |
Time in Service |
44 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys |
Cut Up |
01/2008 |
Cut At |
EMR (Kingsbury) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
20/02/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
27/02/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/02/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
01/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 03/1973 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 11/1975 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/02/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6814 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
01/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37114 |
|
|
16/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
31/12/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37114 |
|
|
01/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|