Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1453 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14859 Week
» 67875 Month
» 187402 Year
» 3214255 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6809 |
01/02/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37109 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
01/02/1963 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Withdrawn |
01/01/2005 |
Time in Service |
41 yrs , 11 mths |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
01/02/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/02/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/02/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6809 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37109 |
|
|
16/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
01/01/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37109 |
|
|