Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1127 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18930 Week
» 71946 Month
» 191473 Year
» 3218326 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6800 |
20/12/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37100 |
02/1974 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
97301 |
2007 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
20/12/1962 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
20/12/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/12/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1976 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 06/1980 |
vot |
Vacuum brakes, No heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/12/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6800 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37100 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
18/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
12/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
2007 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 97301 |
|
|