Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2060 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19863 Week
» 72879 Month
» 192406 Year
» 3219259 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6795 |
08/03/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37095 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3222/8342 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
08/03/1963 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
31/01/1999 |
Time in Service |
35 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys |
Cut Up |
28/02/2005 |
Cut At |
Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
08/03/1963 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
27/11/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
24/08/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/03/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
27/11/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
24/08/1978 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/03/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6795 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3222 Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
27/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
21/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
27/11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37095 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
16/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
24/08/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/11/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
31/01/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37095 |
|
|
28/02/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Carnforth |
|
|