Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 102 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17905 Week
» 70921 Month
» 190448 Year
» 3217301 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6793 |
20/02/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37093 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37509 |
1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3220/8339 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
20/02/1963 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
01/12/2001 |
Time in Service |
38 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys |
Cut Up |
08/2005 |
Cut At |
Unknown (at Cardiff Canton MPD) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
20/02/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 04/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/02/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 04/1975 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 12/1976 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
10/09/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/02/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6793 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3220 Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
05/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37093 |
|
|
26/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
12/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37509 |
|
|
01/12/2001 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37509 |
|
|
08/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Unknown: at Cardiff Canton MPD |
|
|