Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1874 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15280 Week
» 68296 Month
» 187823 Year
» 3214676 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6787 |
31/12/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37087 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
31/12/1962 to Gateshead (52A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
31/12/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 04/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/12/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 04/1975 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6787 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
17/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37087 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|