Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1778 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15184 Week
» 68200 Month
» 187727 Year
» 3214580 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6786 |
28/12/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37086 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37516 |
1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
28/12/1962 to Gateshead (52A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
28/12/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
14/08/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/12/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
14/08/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/12/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6786 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
15/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
19/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
14/08/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37086 |
|
|
16/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37516 |
|
|