Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 286 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18089 Week
» 71105 Month
» 190632 Year
» 3217485 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6785 |
19/12/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37085 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/7) |
37711 |
1985 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
19/12/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
09/1977 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
05/09/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/12/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 04/1975 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 11/1975 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
09/1977 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/09/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/12/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6785 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
26/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
21/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
24/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
18/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37085 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
09/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
05/09/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37711 |
|
|
01/12/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37711 |
|
|
03/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|