Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 165 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17968 Week
» 70984 Month
» 190511 Year
» 3217364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6782 |
29/11/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37082 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37502 |
1985 |
|
TOPS (37/6) |
37602 |
1995 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
29/11/1962 to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
29/11/1962 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
05/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/11/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/12/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 04/1975 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
05/1976 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
xot |
Dual brakes, No heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/11/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6782 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
13/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
11/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37082 |
|
|
16/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
18/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37502 |
|
|
1995 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37602 |
|
|