Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1708 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15114 Week
» 68130 Month
» 187657 Year
» 3214510 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6770 |
17/08/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37070 |
19/01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
17/08/1962 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
22/05/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/08/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
22/05/1970 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/08/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6770 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Thornaby (51L) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
22/05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
19/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37070 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
19/05/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37070 |
|
|
14/07/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Toton Training Compound |
|
|