Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1364 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14770 Week
» 67786 Month
» 187313 Year
» 3214166 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6759 |
12/10/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37059 |
16/11/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3051/D713 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
12/10/1962 to Thornaby (51L) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
12/10/1962 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
07/05/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/10/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
07/05/1970 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
xot |
Dual brakes, No heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/10/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6759 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3051 Allocated to Thornaby (51L) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
07/05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
16/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37059 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
06/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|