Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 3362 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16768 Week
» 69784 Month
» 189311 Year
» 3216164 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6757 |
05/10/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37057 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3049/D711 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
05/10/1962 to Thornaby (51L) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
05/10/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
08/12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/10/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
08/12/1971 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/10/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6757 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3049 Allocated to Thornaby (51L) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
08/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37057 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|