Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 157 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17960 Week
» 70976 Month
» 190503 Year
» 3217356 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6741 |
07/06/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37041 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37520 |
02/09/1987 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
07/06/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/02/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/06/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/02/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/06/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6741 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
05/02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37041 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
02/09/1987 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37520 |
|
|
01/06/2002 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37520 |
|
|
10/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|