Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 700 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31350 Week
» 129995 Month
» 332659 Year
» 3359512 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6740 |
01/06/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37040 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
01/06/1962 to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
Withdrawn |
30/06/2005 |
Time in Service |
43 yrs , 29 dys |
Cut Up |
on 30/04/2006 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
01/06/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
27/02/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
08/08/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/06/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
27/02/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1976 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
08/08/1978 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/06/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6740 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37040 |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
12/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
08/08/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/06/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37040 |
|
|
30/04/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|