Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 32 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17835 Week
» 70851 Month
» 190378 Year
» 3217231 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6739 |
18/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37039 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37504 |
14/03/1986 |
|
TOPS (37/6) |
37603 |
02/05/1996 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
18/05/1962 to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
18/05/1962 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/08/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/05/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/08/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/1981 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6739 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
05/08/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37039 |
|
|
07/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
14/03/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37504 |
|
|
02/05/1996 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37603 |
|
|