Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 286 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6070 Week
» 27459 Month
» 146986 Year
» 3173839 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6738 |
11/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37038 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
11/05/1962 to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
Withdrawn |
01/03/1999 |
Time in Service |
36 yrs, 9 mths , 18 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
11/05/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
04/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
12/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/05/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
04/1978 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
12/1978 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
cX |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6738 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37038 |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
01/03/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37038 |
|
|