Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1005 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6789 Week
» 28178 Month
» 147705 Year
» 3174558 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6737 |
04/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37037 |
02/02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (1)) |
37321 |
23/07/1986 |
|
TOPS (37/0 (R)) |
37037 |
21/04/1989 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
04/05/1962 to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
Withdrawn |
01/08/2000 |
Time in Service |
38 yrs, 2 mths , 28 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
04/05/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
26/08/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/05/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
26/08/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/1981 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6737 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/08/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37037 |
|
|
16/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
09/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
23/07/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37321 |
|
|
21/04/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37037 |
|
|
01/08/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37037 |
|
|