Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 616 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6400 Week
» 27789 Month
» 147316 Year
» 3174169 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6725 |
31/08/1961 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37025 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
2888/D604 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
31/08/1961 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
01/02/1999 |
Time in Service |
37 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
31/08/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/08/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 06/1974 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 11/1975 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1977 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6725 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2888 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37025 |
|
|
16/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
02/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
07/06/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (ML) |
|
|
05/06/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
01/02/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37025 |
|
|